+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Opportunity Zones in Baltimore County and Target Redevelopment Areas in Washington County
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-5)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Qualified Opportunity Zones in Baltimore County and Target Redevelopment Areas in Washington County
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {589234/1 Adopted
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Text - First - Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-236 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-0)
- Yeas: 126
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (125-5)
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 5
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 12, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor