+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {724136/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
724136/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor