+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-10)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-701 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
- Nays: 10
March 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46