+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-12A-01 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 5, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 8, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 5, 2018: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor