+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-8)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (42-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates Vallario, Sydnor, and Moon
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Hough, Muse, and Raskin
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) {273523/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {502316/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {478474/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 8
April 6, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
April 4, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 7, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor