+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 23, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
March 7, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor