+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-38)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation and Student Members
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {823226/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-108.1 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (94-38)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 38
March 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
January 11, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor