+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-29)
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Referred Judiciary
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {183429/1 Adopted
- Text - Third - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-304, 10-306, 10-307, 9-501 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (98-29)
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 29
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
February 21, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
January 5, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor