+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {795863/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable with Amendments {114138/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Text - Third - Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On December 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Baltimore County - Board of Education - Election of Officers
- Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-2B-01, 3-2B-03, 3-2B-04, 3-2B-09 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 26, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor