+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 628971/1 Report Adopted
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
628971/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
February 11, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor