+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (98-40)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-7)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {607870/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
- First Reading Finance
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 23-701 through 23-712 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (98-40)
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 40
March 25, 2021: Third Reading Passed (40-7)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 7
March 24, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
January 11, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor