+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 814733/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
814733/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 23, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 14, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor