+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 104
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Individual Market Health Insurance Subsidies
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (99-33)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-1)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {906389/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-2)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Assessment Applicability and State–Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {547179/1 Adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {547179/1
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a State-Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-102.1 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 6
March 15, 2020: Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (133-1)
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (99-33)
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 33
March 6, 2020: Third Reading Passed (43-2)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 2
March 2, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
January 13, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor