+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendment
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {142418/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On November 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
142418/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-8A-15 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 26, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
March 25, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
January 10, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor