+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-5)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-606 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 5
February 7, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor