+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-44)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (34-11)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred Senate Rules
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-2401 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 25, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 44
March 24, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor