+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 4/07 at 2:00 p.m.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {194537/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred Senate Rules
- Motion Rules Suspended Referred
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
194537/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1605.2 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 4, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 27, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor