+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (112-0)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Economic Matters
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {713925/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
713925/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 3, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 112
March 25, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor