+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {117170/1 Adopted
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Text - First - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
- Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-302, 16-310, 16-503, 16-512, 16-5A-04, 16-5A-05 - Article - Business Occupations and Professions
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
January 30, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
January 27, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
December 19, 2019: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor