+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
- Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
On October 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-247 - Article - Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor