+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {516288/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {334139/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-103 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor