+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {866788/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {983720/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {744033/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred Senate Rules
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 28, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor