+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (141-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {428974/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
428974/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 5, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 141
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45