+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor