+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {543521/1 Adopted
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
543521/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-812 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 31, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 18, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 9, 2016: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor