+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {474031/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
474031/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor