+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 30, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 18, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor