+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-302.2 - Article - Education
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor