+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-203 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 18, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor