+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Committee Amendment {618474/1 Adopted
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {618474/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
- First Reading Senate Rules