+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {196889/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
196889/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 8-416 - Article - Education
- 13-601 through 13-605 - Article - Health - General
- 15-125 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 26, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
March 25, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
January 16, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor