+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 18, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor