+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {627777/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-5A-08 - Article - Human Services
+ − Vote
March 15, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor