+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {149233/3 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {999231/1 Adopted
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {999231/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - 21st-Century Economy Sales Tax Act
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-101, 11-102, 11-103, 11-217, 11-221, 2-1302.1 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor