+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
On November 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 29, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 12, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor