+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-14)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-47)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {633123/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
633123/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 47
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor