+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {634435/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Trustees
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {250713/1 Adopted
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Text - First - Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Appointment of Trustees
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-202, 3-203, 3-204 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 10, 2021: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- Yeas: 139
February 7, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor