+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- Text - Third - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment for Nurses and Nursing Support Staff - Program Establishment and Funding
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {953628/1 Adopted
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment for Nurses and Nursing Workers - Program Establishment and Funding
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 24-1801 through 24-1806 - Article - Health - General
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor