+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {734833/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable with Amendments {564833/1 Adopted
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {743398/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
- Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-20
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 26-102, 26-1104, 26-1408, 26-1801, 26-1806, 26-2102, 26-2801, 26-2801.1, 4-109, 4-407, 6-304, 6-402 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2021: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-1)
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
February 5, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor