+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments {940212/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
940212/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1