+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
- Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
March 13, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 17, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor