+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 22-1001, 22-102, 22-1405, 22-1602 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 19-1801 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 6, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor