+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-44)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 722019/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
722019/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 22, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 44
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor