+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {550713/1 Adopted
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Text - First - Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Use, Sale, Possession, Setting, Placing, or Maintaining – Alterations
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-410 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Third Reading Passed (137-1)
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor