+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {557979/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {703292/1 Report Adopted
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 29, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 24, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor