+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {760010/1 Adopted
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-713, 4-714 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Yeas: 138
January 30, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor