+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (99-37)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {334339/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-36)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {433123/1 Rejected (43-91)
- Special Order until later today (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {713627/1 Rejected (42-89)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {370119/1 Report Adopted
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-203 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 37
March 30, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 10, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 10, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDermott) {433123/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 91
March 10, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {713627/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 89
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor