+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
- Text - Chapter - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (124-14)
- Passed Enrolled
- Text - Enrolled - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zucker) Adopted
- Motion Reconsider Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
- Motion to withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
- Substitute Committee Amendment {655467/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
- Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-10)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Text - Third - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted
- Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
- Text - First - Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5-206 - Article - Education
- 9-1A-01, 9-1A-03, 9-1A-33, 9-1A-36, 9-1D-01, 9-1D-02, 9-1D-03, 9-1D-04, 9-1D-05, 9-1E-01 through 9-1E-16 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (124-14)
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 14
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 11, 2021: Third Reading Passed (129-10)
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 10
March 10, 2021: Floor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 93
March 5, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 2, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor