+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendment
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {304038/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {750218/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- 20-202 - Article - Land Use
- 20-204 - Article - Land Use
- 20-206 - Article - Land Use
- 20-709 - Article - Land Use
- 21-102 - Article - Land Use
- 21-105 - Article - Land Use
- 21-201 - Article - Land Use
- 21-202 - Article - Land Use
- 21-203 - Article - Land Use
- 22-104 - Article - Land Use
- 22-120 - Article - Land Use
- 22-203 - Article - Land Use
- 22-206 - Article - Land Use
- 22-216 - Article - Land Use
- 25-201 - Article - Land Use
- 25-206 - Article - Land Use
- 25-301 - Article - Land Use
- 22-407 - Article - Land Use
- 23-401 - Article - Land Use
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 31, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 23, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor