+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Abortion Care Access Act
- Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 56
- Overridden (29-15)
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Overridden (90-46)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment {713929/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-29)
- Floor Amendment {583721/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-29)
- Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (29-14)
- Floor Amendment {323025/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-28)
- Third Reading Passed (28-15)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {713929/1 (Senator Hershey)
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
- Favorable
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (89-47)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Floor Amendment {833427/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (42-86)
- Floor Amendment {793523/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (41-85)
- Floor Amendment {663627/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-84)
- Floor Amendment {603822/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (39-83)
- Floor Amendment {813820/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (40-84)
- Floor Amendment {733129/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (40-85)
- Floor Amendment {713423/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-84)
- Floor Amendment {483526/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (39-87)
- Floor Amendment {553924/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (40-86)
- Floor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (38-88)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Text - Third - Abortion Care Access Act
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Rose) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {823122/1 Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Abortion Care Access Act
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 13-4401 through 13-4407, 15-103, 20-103, 20-207 through 20-209 - Article - Health - General
- 15-857, 31-122 - Article - Insurance
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (21)
April 9, 2022: Overridden (90-46)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 46
April 9, 2022: Overridden (29-15)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 15
March 29, 2022: Floor Amendment {583721/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-29)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 29
March 29, 2022: Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (29-14)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 14
March 29, 2022: Third Reading Passed (28-15)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 15
March 29, 2022: Floor Amendment {323025/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-28)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 28
March 29, 2022: Floor Amendment {713929/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-29)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 29
March 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (89-47)
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 47
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {813820/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (40-84)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 84
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {833427/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (42-86)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 86
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {313123/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (38-88)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 88
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {483526/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (39-87)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 87
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {553924/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (40-86)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 86
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {603822/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (39-83)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 83
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {663627/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-84)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 84
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {713423/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-84)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 84
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {733129/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (40-85)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 85
March 9, 2022: Floor Amendment {793523/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (41-85)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 85
March 7, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 7, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 14, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor